MD SB184 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide coverage for diagnostic and supplemental breast examinations from imposing a copayment, coinsurance, or deductible requirement for the examination; and requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to study and report to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly by October 1, 2023, on the financial impact of eliminating cost-sharing for diagnostic image-guided biopsies for breast cancer.
Title
Health Insurance - Diagnostic and Supplemental Examinations and Biopsies for Breast Cancer - Cost-Sharing
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Dawn Gile [D] | Sen. Katie Hester [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {243821/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {893727/1 Adopted |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB376 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299