MD SB170 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the maximum maturity date of school construction bonds that the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners may issue; and requiring that the Board report by December 1, 2011, to committees of the General Assembly on a long-term plan for the alignment of public school facilities with projected enrollments and educational programs within the Baltimore City Public School System.
Title
Baltimore City - Education - Public School Facilities and Construction Bond
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-8) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2011-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |