MD SB153 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB203
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation to develop and implement a certain training program for certain transportation-sector employees, taxicab drivers, and transportation network operators on the identification and reporting of suspected child exploitation and human trafficking; requiring certain transportation-sector employers to establish procedures for reporting suspected child exploitation and human trafficking to certain entities; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Transportation - Child Exploitation and Human Trafficking Awareness, Training, and Response
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB203 (Carry Over) 2023-01-24 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Airports
Awareness and Outreach
Child Abuse and Neglect
Drivers' Licenses
Good Samaritan
Human Trafficking
Job Training
Language
Liability
Licenses
Mass Transit
Ports
Public Employees
Public Service Commission
Reports
Ridesharing and Carsharing
Signs and Billboards
State Employees
Taxicabs
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Victims
Awareness and Outreach
Child Abuse and Neglect
Drivers' Licenses
Good Samaritan
Human Trafficking
Job Training
Language
Liability
Licenses
Mass Transit
Ports
Public Employees
Public Service Commission
Reports
Ridesharing and Carsharing
Signs and Billboards
State Employees
Taxicabs
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 10 | 208.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 10 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0153?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0153f.pdf |