MD SB151 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB516
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the authority of the Secretary of Transportation to designate a transit-oriented development; establishing the Transit-Oriented Development Capital Grant and Revolving Loan Fund to promote the equitable and inclusive development of transit-oriented developments; authorizing the Department of Transportation to use the Fund to provide certain financial assistance to local jurisdictions; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2025 an appropriation of $5,000,000 to the Fund; etc.
Title
Equitable and Inclusive Transit-Oriented Development Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-11) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {743025/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB12 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
SB516 (Carry Over) 2022-03-23 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
SB516 (Carry Over) 2022-03-23 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Community Development
Comptroller
Economic Development
Governor
Grants
internet
Loans
Low-Income
Mass Transit
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Community Development
Comptroller
Economic Development
Governor
Grants
internet
Loans
Low-Income
Mass Transit
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 10 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 1204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 1205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |