MD SB15 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB2
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an intake officer to file a petition alleging that a child under the age of 13 years is either delinquent or a child in need of supervision if the child is alleged to have committed an act that results in the death of a victim; and requiring a law enforcement officer to forward a complaint alleging that a child under the age of 13 years committed an act that resulted in the death of a victim to the Department of Juvenile Services.
Title
Juvenile Law - Child in Need of Supervision - Mandatory Petition and Notice (NyKayla Strawder Memorial Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {253121/1 Adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2022-11-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB15 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |