MD SB147 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adding an adult grandchild of a certain decedent to the list of persons who have the right to arrange for the final disposition of the body of the decedent; requiring a person to forfeit the right of final disposition of the body of a decedent and that the right pass to the next qualifying person under certain circumstances; providing that a certain person's right of disposition may be restored under certain circumstances; authorizing a person to waive the right of final disposition; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231
2019-03-27SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-27SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (130-0)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {726489/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {897075/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0147&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0147f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0147t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0147e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_231_sb0147e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0147_89707501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0147_72648901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0147.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0147_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0147_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0404.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0147_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0917.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0801.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback