MD SB141 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-17 - Hearing 1/27 at 9:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-17 - Hearing 1/27 at 9:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that law enforcement officers are subject to forfeiture of benefits from the State Retirement and Pension System or a local system when a law enforcement officer is found guilty of, pleads guilty to, or enters a plea of nolo contendere to a felony, perjury or a misdemeanor relating to truthfulness and veracity committed in the course of the performance of a law enforcement officer's duties; and providing for the processes and procedures to implement a forfeiture of benefits.
Title
Pensions and Retirement – Forfeiture of Benefits – Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 9:00 a.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB123 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Court Orders
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Forfeiture
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Retirement
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Forfeiture
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Retirement
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0141?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0141f.pdf |