MD SB14 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a copy of an application for a search warrant to be filed with the State's Attorney or a deputy State's Attorney designated in writing by the State's Attorney for the county in which the search warrant is to be served prior to the execution of the search warrant.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrant Application - Copy Filed with State's
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn | |
2010-01-14 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2009-07-27 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0014.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0014f.pdf |