MD SB128 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering for fiscal years 2016 and 2017 a definition to determine the number of students used to calculate a grant for schools that participate in a specified federal program; requiring a specified study to include a specified review of the identification of low- income students for the purpose of providing State education aid; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Compensatory Education Grants - Federal Community Eligibility Provision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-18HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2014-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {259637/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2014-02-05SenateHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-17SenateHearing cancelled
2014-01-22SenateHearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-08SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2013-11-01SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback