MD SB1265 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Center for School Safety to collaborate with certain persons and entities to provide a comprehensive approach to school safety; requiring the School Safety Subcabinet to develop a model policy for building assessment teams; requiring the development of a training curriculum for school resource officers and other school security employees; authorizing the Safe Schools Fund to provide grants to local school systems to enhance school safety; requiring a $10,000,000 annual appropriation to the Fund for certain purposes;etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {843425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (18-26) (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {703025/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted (25-20) (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {223621/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (5-40) (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2018-04-09HouseFloor Committee Amendment {945267/1 Adopted
2018-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-07HouseFloor Committee Amendment {655168/1 Adopted
2018-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {865662/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-04-06HouseHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-04-06HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2018-04-05HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {843425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (18-26)
2018-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {543527/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {503124/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {393226/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {703523/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {703025/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted (25-20)
2018-04-05SenateFloor Amendment {193529/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2018-04-04SenateSpecial Order until 4/5 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {223621/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (5-40)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Committee Amendment {939631/1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFloor Committee Amendment {789735/1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {829138/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2018-03-13SenateReferred Senate Rules
2018-03-13SenateMotion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted
2018-03-13SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects

Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Assessments
Baltimore City
Budgets
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Contracts
Counselors
Counties
Curriculum
Data
Disabilities
Disclosure
Eastern Shore
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Grants
Health Insurance
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
State Police, Department of
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Threats
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Violence

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1265&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1265f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1265t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1265e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_30_sb1265e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_22362101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_78973501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_82913801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_93963101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_19352901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_39322601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_50312401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_54352701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_70302502.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_70352301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_84342501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_65516801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_86566201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1265_94526701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb1265.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1265_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1129.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1148.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1149.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1160.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1265_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1325.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1378.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback