MD SB126 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing, for certain fiscal years, the requirement that the Secretary of Transportation withhold 35% of the State's share of annual operating grants for the Washington Suburban Transit District if the State's operating assistance provided in the approved Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority budget increases by more than 3% over the total operating assistance provided in the prior fiscal year; and requiring the Secretary to withhold 35% of the State's share of grants for the District under certain circumstances.
Title
Transportation - WMATA Operating Assistance - Alteration (Maryland Metro Funding Act of 2024)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533 |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-31) |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {683223/1 Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {683223/1 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2023-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB198 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Subjects
Budgets
Grants
Mass Transit
Operating Budget
Revenue and Taxes
Secretary of State
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Grants
Mass Transit
Operating Budget
Revenue and Taxes
Secretary of State
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 10 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |