MD HB198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing, for certain fiscal years, the requirement that the Secretary of Transportation withhold 35% of the State's share of annual operating grants for the Washington Suburban Transit District if the State's operating assistance provided in the approved Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority budget increases by more than 3% over the total operating assistance provided in the prior fiscal year.
Title
Transportation - WMATA Operating Assistance - Alteration (Maryland Metro Funding Act of 2024)
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] | Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534 |
2024-03-28 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-30) |
2024-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {263527/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-01-05 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2023-09-26 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB126 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Subjects
Budgets
Grants
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Operating Budget
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Grants
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Operating Budget
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 10 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |