MD SB116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a local government may spend 100 percent of its future annual apportionment on development projects and capital renewal after it has exceeded its acquisition goals under Program Open Space; requiring the Joint Subcommittee on Program Open Space and Agricultural Land Preservation to review the State's specified standard for land acquisition to determine if adjustments to the standard would encourage additional land acquisition; requiring a specified report by the Joint Committee; etc.
Title
Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Local Government Apportionment and Use of Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {234132/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Construction
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Planning, Department of
Program Open Space
Real Property
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Zoning and Planning
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Planning, Department of
Program Open Space
Real Property
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Zoning and Planning