MD SB1131 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a certain insurance identification card to be issued for a period of 12 months for a 12-month commercial motor vehicle insurance policy covering three or more vehicles even if the payment by the insured is for a period of less than 12 months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance - Commercial Policies - Insurance Identification Card

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-04-05HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-13SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback