MD SB112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-26 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-26 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Police Commissioner of Baltimore City, following each decennial census of the United States, to prepare a plan for the adjustment of the geographic boundaries and composition of each Baltimore City police district and the reallocation of the resources and personnel of the Baltimore City Police Department among each district using specified information; requiring the Commissioner to present the plan to the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City within a specified time period; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Public Local Laws
Public Safety
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Counties - Local Laws
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Public Local Laws
Public Safety
Reapportionment and Redistricting