MD SB112 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling at retail, offering for sale at retail, or distributing for retail sale in the State a novelty lighter; establishing a civil penalty for a violation of the Act; defining the term "novelty lighter"; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Sale of Novelty Lighters - Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] |
Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Edward Kasemeyer [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {683624/1 Rejected (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {683624/1 Rejected (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-03-25 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (43-3) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Rejected (5-42) | |
2011-03-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Rejected | |
2011-03-23 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Rejected | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Cigarettes
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Smoking
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Smoking