MD SB1096 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the formula used to apportion income to the State for corporations that carry on a trade or business in and out of the State; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |