MD SB1073 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB886
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the General Assembly to appoint a delegation to an amendments convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution and an advisory committee under certain circumstances and in accordance with certain requirements; providing for the membership of the delegation; providing for the qualifications, oath, compensation, and duties of a commissioner to the delegation; establishing the operations of the delegation and the advisory committee; etc.
Title
Amendments Convention Called Under Article V of the U.S. Constitution - Delegation to the Convention
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Sen. Johnny Salling [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB1073 (Carry Over) 2024-02-13 - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
HB1202 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-29 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1202 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-29 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Committees and Commissions
Constitution, U.S.
Constitutional Amendments
Examinations
General Assembly
Legislators
Notices
Oaths
Public Officials
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Constitution, U.S.
Constitutional Amendments
Examinations
General Assembly
Legislators
Notices
Oaths
Public Officials
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - General Assembly
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 10 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 1703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 1704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 1705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 1706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1073?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb1073f.pdf |