MD SB1061 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extending to October 1, 2024, the termination provision relating to the authority of the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to impose a transfer tax on certain instruments of writing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-03SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2020-02-26SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
St. Mary's County1381B(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1381F(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback