MD SB1061 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to October 1, 2024, the termination provision relating to the authority of the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to impose a transfer tax on certain instruments of writing.
Title
St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
St. Mary's County | 138 | 1B | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
St. Mary's County | 138 | 1F | (n/a) | See Bill Text |