MD SB106 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 931
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 931
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the State Board of Social Work Examiners; and repealing obsolete references to certified social worker licenses.
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Board Membership and Certified Social Worker Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 931 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB755 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 930
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 19 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |