MD SB106 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to annually include $500,000 in the annual budget bill for the Baltimore City State's Attorney's Office and the Prince George's County State's Attorney's Office for grants to nonprofit organizations to fund violence prevention and community service initiatives; requiring the offices to establish certain procedures and enhance certain coordination of services; requiring an organization that receives grant funding to comply with certain data sharing and reporting requirements; etc.
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Grant Funding - Violence Prevention and Community Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB345 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Community Facilities and Services
Governor
Grants
Local Government - Generally
Nonprofit Organizations
Prince George's County
Public Safety
Revenue and Taxes
State's Attorneys
Violence
Baltimore City
Community Facilities and Services
Governor
Grants
Local Government - Generally
Nonprofit Organizations
Prince George's County
Public Safety
Revenue and Taxes
State's Attorneys
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 4 | 1002.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0106?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0106f.pdf |