MD SB106 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors exercises its powers, duties, and functions subject to the authority of the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation.
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Authority of the Secretary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Contractors
Heating and Cooling
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Heating and Cooling
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations