MD SB1052 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax in the amount of $3,500 for qualifying members of the Maryland Defense Force; providing that an individual may not qualify for the subtraction modification based on membership in the Maryland Defense Force unless the Maryland Defense Force maintains specified records and provides specified reports; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2010.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Defense Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-26 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB1052.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb1052f.pdf |