MD SB105 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders; requiring that the Secretary of Health, rather than the Governor, make appointments to the Advisory Council; and prohibiting the Secretary from appointing voting members to the Advisory Council until a certain term expires or unless a seat is vacant.
Title
State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders – Membership and Appointments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Diseases
Governor
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
State Employees
Voting
Diseases
Governor
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
State Employees
Voting