MD SB1048 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a recorded covenant affecting property owned by a certain cemetery company be rendered invalid by substantially changed circumstances if, since the execution of the covenant, at least 100 years have elapsed and a State highway has been constructed on adjoining property.
Title
Real Property – Recorded Covenants – Substantially Changed Circumstances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |