MD SB1036 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a civil fine for smoking marijuana in public; and providing that smoking marijuana in a public place is a criminal misdemeanor with a fine not exceeding $100.
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Amusement Parks and Carnivals
Churches
Commerce and Business
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Fines
Forests and Parks
Hotels and Motels
Mass Transit
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Restaurants
Sidewalks
Smoking
Sports and Recreation
Theaters
Churches
Commerce and Business
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Fines
Forests and Parks
Hotels and Motels
Mass Transit
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Restaurants
Sidewalks
Smoking
Sports and Recreation
Theaters