MD SB103 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB625

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "retail pet store" to include a broker that transfers dogs or cats for resale by another person for purposes of certain provisions of law regulating retail pet stores; clarifying a certain prohibition on the sale of cats or dogs by retail pet stores; establishing the Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards to examine canine breeding practices and make recommendations by December 1, 2021, for any legislative actions needed to create standards for persons selling dogs in the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Animals - Retail Pet Stores and the Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Floor Amendment 213524/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 13 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 448
2021-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (43-4)
2021-04-08SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (106-31)
2021-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {883894/1 Adopted
2021-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-04-05HouseHearing 4/05 at 5:00 p.m.
2021-03-16HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-19HouseReferred Economic Matters
2021-02-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-2)
2021-02-16SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-16SenateFloor Amendment {213524/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-33)
2021-02-10SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2021-02-10SenateFloor Amendment {213524/1 (Senator Hough)
2021-02-10SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-02-05SenateMotion Special Order until 2/9 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2021-02-05SenateFavorable
2021-02-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-10-29SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB625 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2018(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation19701(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation19703(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0103?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0103f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0103t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0103e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_448_sb0103e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0103_21352401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0103_88389401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0103_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0103_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0206.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0237.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1188.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1061.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback