MD SB625 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB103
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "retail pet store" to include a broker that transfers dogs for resale by another person for purposes of certain provisions of law regulating retail pet stores; clarifying a certain prohibition on the sale of cats or dogs by retail pet stores; repealing a certain statement of intent of the General Assembly; and altering a certain definition.
Title
Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {577470/2 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB625 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Subjects
Animals
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Electronic Commerce
internet
Retail Sales
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Electronic Commerce
internet
Retail Sales
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 19 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 19 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |