MD SB1015 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a residential condominium unit owner or a vendor of or a lot owner in a development who is selling the property shall provide specified disclosure documents without charge to a purchaser; and providing that, notwithstanding any other provision in specified provisions of law, the mortgagee or trustee designated under the deed of trust shall provide disclosure documents to the purchaser of a condominium unit or a lot in a development at a foreclosure sale.
Title
Residential Property - Condominium Unit Owners or Lot Owners - Provision of
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-20 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Condominiums
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Fees
Foreclosure
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Mortgages
Notices
Real Property
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Fees
Foreclosure
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Mortgages
Notices
Real Property
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB1015.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb1015f.pdf |