MD SB1004 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt regulations requiring a video lottery facility licensee to adopt procedures to offer players the opportunity to donate coins, when receiving cash on payout, to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; and requiring the Commission to adopt regulations requiring a licensee to attach donation boxes near exits in a video lottery facility for specified purposes; requiring the Commission to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019.
Title
Pilot Program - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2016-03-25 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) {119931/1 Adopted |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Gaming
Gifts
Lottery
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Gaming
Gifts
Lottery
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans