MD HB990 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from hunting an antlered deer in Garrett County unless the deer has at least three points measuring 1 inch or longer on the main beam of one antler; and specifying that a point does not include a brow tine.
Title
Garrett County - Deer Hunting - Three-Point Rule
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |