MD HB987 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide comprehensive technical assistance to any business that qualifies for certain financial assistance; requiring the Program to include certain types of technical assistance; requiring the Corporation to include a detailed description of the implementation of the program in its annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly; and requiring the Corporation to adopt regulations to carry out the Program.
Title
Economic Development – Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program – Establishment
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-7) |
2021-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {375163/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Economic and Community Development
Industry and Technology
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Economic and Community Development
Industry and Technology
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 4B-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |