MD HB983 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Police Training Commission, in consultation with the State Department of Education, to develop a cultural competency model training curriculum for specified law enforcement officers; providing for the contents of the cultural competency model training curriculum; and encouraging specified law enforcement officers assigned to public schools to complete the cultural competency model training curriculum before beginning an assignment in a public school.
Title
Public Schools - Law Enforcement Officers - Cultural Competency Model Training
Sponsors
Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Gerron Levi [D] | Del. Craig Rice [D] | Del. Justin Ross [D] |
Del. Jay Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (131-6) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Minorities
Police Training Commission
Public Schools
Education, State Department of
Ethnic Affairs
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Minorities
Police Training Commission
Public Schools