MD HB972 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law that relate to specified licenses issued in St. Mary's County for hucksters, peddlers, and other specified businesses.
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Clerks of Court
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Fingerprinting
Fortune Telling
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Sheriffs
St. Mary's County
Transient Merchants
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Fingerprinting
Fortune Telling
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Sheriffs
St. Mary's County
Transient Merchants