MD HB96 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Department of the Environment test the waters in restricted shellfish harvest areas at specified frequencies under specified circumstances.
Title
Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-15 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Clams
Environment, Department of
Examinations
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Oysters
Water
Environment, Department of
Examinations
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Oysters
Water