MD HB957 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB298
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1451
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1451
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding to every roadway in the State the requirement that the driver of a vehicle traveling slower than the general speed of traffic drive the vehicle in the right-hand lanes if practicable as determined by the driver; and providing that, on a roadway that has three or more lanes for traffic moving in the same direction with a certain posted maximum speed limit, the far left lane may be used only for overtaking and passing another vehicle in a certain manner and under certain circumstances.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Lanes of Travel - Slower Traffic and Overtaking and Passing (MOVE GET OUT THE WAY Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB957 (Carry Over) 2023-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
HB1451 (Carry Over) 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1451 (Carry Over) 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |