MD HB1451 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB957
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, on a roadway that has three or more lanes for traffic moving in the same direction with a posted maximum speed limit of 55 miles per hour or more, the far left lane may be used only for the overtaking and passing of another vehicle in a specified manner and under specified circumstances; and establishing that the penalty for a violation of the Act for a first offense is $75, for a second offense is $150, and for a third or subsequent offense is $250.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Left Lane - Use for Passing
Sponsors
Sen. William Folden [R] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Seth Howard [R] |
Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Del. Herbert McMillan [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (73-66) (Y: 73 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {953628/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (51-83) (Y: 51 N: 83 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {273721/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (42-91) (Y: 42 N: 91 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {953628/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (51-83) (Y: 51 N: 83 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {273721/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (42-91) (Y: 42 N: 91 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (73-66) |
2017-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {953628/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (51-83) |
2017-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {273721/1 (Delegate Kramer) Rejected (42-91) |
2017-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {133024/1 (Delegate J. Lewis) Rejected |
2017-03-20 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {840415/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1451 (Carry Over) 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.