MD HB936 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission to study and make recommendations regarding the land use needs to meet the full generation capacity authorized under the Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program; and requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.
Title
Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-29) |
2022-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {773226/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB999 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-23 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Agriculture
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Farmland
Local Government - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Power Plants
Reports
Solar Energy
Sunset
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Farmland
Local Government - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Power Plants
Reports
Solar Energy
Sunset
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures