MD HB936 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to complete a study on the feasibility and effects of increasing Baltimore City's homestead property tax credit assessment cap and using the increased revenue to offset a reduction in Baltimore City's property tax rate; requiring the study to make specified estimates and to consider specified matters; requiring the Department to report findings and any recommendations on or before December 31, 2014; and providing the Act shall terminate at the end of June 30, 2015.
Title
Baltimore City - Homestead Assessment Cap Increase and Property Tax Rate Reduction - Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {845065/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Legislative Services, Department of
Property Tax
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Legislative Services, Department of
Property Tax
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local