MD HB936 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of rape in the second degree of a child under the age of 13 years; increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of a sexual offense in the second degree against a child under the age of 13 years; altering requirements relating to the registration on a specified registry of individuals who have committed specified sex offenses; etc.
Title
Crimes - Sex Offenders - Notification, Registration, and Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Senators Brochin, Haines, and Raskin | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1) | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) Withdrawn | |
2010-04-05 | Special Order later today (Senator Harris) Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-04 | Delegates Dumais, Waldstreicher, and Frank | |
2010-04-04 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-04 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-04 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-03-19 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Special Order 3/19 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Special Order 3/17 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Child Care
Computers
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Expungement
Genetics
Identification
Indigent Persons
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Telecommunications
Witnesses
Computers
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Expungement
Genetics
Identification
Indigent Persons
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Telecommunications
Witnesses