MD HB927 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an entity or a specified qualified organization in Calvert County licensed to offer electronic or instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on December 31, 2008, to continue to operate a game of electronic or instant bingo under specified conditions; requiring the State Lottery Commission to establish procedures and regulations relating to electronic bingo machines in Calvert County; imposing tax rates on specified net proceeds; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2016.
Title
Calvert County - Electronic Bingo
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (132-4) | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments 145965/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-16 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Auditors and Audits
Bingo
Calvert County
Committees and Commissions
Equipment
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Auditors and Audits
Bingo
Calvert County
Committees and Commissions
Equipment
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Rules and Regulations
Sunset