MD HB923 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Secretary of Higher Education is appointed by and serves at the pleasure of the Governor; requiring each institution of higher education to adopt a written policy that provides reasonable academic accommodations for students to practice sincerely held faith-based or religious beliefs; altering eligibility criteria for and the process for awards from the Delegate Howard P. Rawlings Program of Educational Excellence Awards; altering the administration of the Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Appointment of Secretary and Student Financial Assistance - Accommodations at Public Institutions for Religious Beliefs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634 |
2023-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {763129/1 Adopted |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {763129/1 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment {783221/1 Adopted |
2023-03-20 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313524/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB662 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-04 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Age
Auditors and Audits
Certifications
Community Colleges
Counties
Examinations
Federal Aid
Food Insecurity
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Licenses
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Secondary Schools
State Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Substance Abuse
Time
Tuition
Weights and Measures
Auditors and Audits
Certifications
Community Colleges
Counties
Examinations
Federal Aid
Food Insecurity
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Licenses
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Secondary Schools
State Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Substance Abuse
Time
Tuition
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Education | 11 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 15 | 136 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 303.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 303.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3603.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |