MD HB904 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring local management boards to provide specified information to the Department of Legislative Services by October 1, 2014; requiring specified State agencies to provide specified information on State spending in each county and municipal corporation for services and programs for children, youth, and families to the Department by October 1, 2014; requiring the Department to collect information and present a report to the General Assembly in the form of a data resource guide by January 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {674669/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Children
Children, Governor's Office for
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Grants
Legislative Services, Department of
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Children
Children, Governor's Office for
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Grants
Legislative Services, Department of
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
State Aid