MD HB892 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a custodian of records for the Motor Vehicle Administration to deny inspection by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the part of a public record that contains personal information unless the custodian is provided with a valid warrant issued by a federal court or a court of this State; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to annually report information on the number of certain requests from a certain U.S. agency to the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2022, and each June 1 thereafter; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act – Motor Vehicle Administration – Warrant for Personal Information and Reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB649 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions4320(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback