MD HB892 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a custodian of records for the Motor Vehicle Administration to deny inspection by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the part of a public record that contains personal information unless the custodian is provided with a valid warrant issued by a federal court or a court of this State; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to annually report information on the number of certain requests from a certain U.S. agency to the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2022, and each June 1 thereafter; etc.
Title
Public Information Act – Motor Vehicle Administration – Warrant for Personal Information and Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB649 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Courts
Disclosure
Federal Government
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Subpoenas
Warrants
Courts
Disclosure
Federal Government
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Subpoenas
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 4 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0892?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0892f.pdf |