MD HB891 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the application of provisions of law governing grievance procedures for certain employees; requiring a grievant to complete certain forms in sufficient detail that will allow for the expeditious resolution of the grievance; applying a certain definition of "grievance" to a certain requirement that the Department of Transportation adopt certain regulations relating to employee grievance procedures; etc.
Title
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures
Sponsors
Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
Del. Kirill Reznik [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-37) (Y: 97 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-38) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-38) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-37) |
2019-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {597675/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-38) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Communications
Forms
internet
Notices
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation, Department of
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Communications
Forms
internet
Notices
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation, Department of