MD HB886 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the annual compensation of the chair and members of the Board of License Commissioners for Calvert County.
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Compensation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Calvert County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Calvert County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 14 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 14 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |