MD HB883 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class B-D beer, wine, and liquor license in Allegany County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Allegany County to issue a Class B-D license for use by a certain restaurant; authorizing a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for
on-premises consumption; requiring the license holder to submit a certain Food Alcohol Ratio Report to the Board once every licensing cycle; providing an annual licensing fee of $700; prohibiting the issuance of more than two Class B-D licenses in a single year; etc.
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {843199/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB677 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Auctions
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reports
Restaurants
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Auctions
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reports
Restaurants
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 9 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 9 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 9 | 1602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |