MD HB864 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a memorandum of understanding agreed to and ratified under certain provisions of law from expiring until it is succeeded by a memorandum of understanding agreed to and ratified under certain provisions of law; requiring that the terms of a certain memorandum of understanding continue in force and effect until a certain memorandum of understanding is agreed to and ratified; authorizing an exclusive representative to file a certain action in a circuit court under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-47) (Y: 89 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {433920/2 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-84) (Y: 50 N: 85 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-47) (Y: 89 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {433920/2 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-84) (Y: 50 N: 85 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-47) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment {433920/2 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-84) |
2018-03-13 | House | Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {444863/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |